Gilliam v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Deborah A Gilliam
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv12793
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Paul D Borman
1 Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Deborah A Gilliam served on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Versical, Bethany)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Pere on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Pere, Luis)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissioner of Social Security* (ATee)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (ATee)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deborah A Gilliam against Commissioner of Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6895287 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Clare - County Where Action Arose: Ingham - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Versical, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Luis A. Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A Gilliam
Represented By: Bethany G. Versical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?