Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated v. Dunn Paper, Inc.
Plaintiff: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated
Defendant: Dunn Paper, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv12800
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for Order For Waiver of Obligation for Local Counsel Pursuant to LR83.20 (f) (1) (Certification in Support of Motion by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated (Fiorilla, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Order For Waiver of Obligation for Local Counsel Pursuant to LR83.20 (f) (1) by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated. (Fiorilla, John)
October 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 10/31/2018. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (DPar)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/30/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Bench Trial set for 10/8/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Fletcher, Gary)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2018 09:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dunn Paper, Inc.. (Fletcher, Gary)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Dunn Paper, Inc.* (SKra)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated (Fiorilla, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated against Dunn Paper, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6896455 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: St Clair - County of 1st Defendant: St Clair. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Fiorilla, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated v. Dunn Paper, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn Paper, Inc.
Represented By: Gary A. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Incorporated
Represented By: John K. Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?