Rodgers v. Oakland County et al

Plaintiff: Dujuan Keith Rodgers
Defendant: JOHN DOE, Oakland County and Michael J. Bouchard
Case Number: 2:2018cv12832
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 8 RE-NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing RESET for 2/22/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
October 15, 2018 7 NOTICE OF HEARING on #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
October 10, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Michael J. Bouchard, Oakland County. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Andrews v. Wayne County, #3 Exhibit B - Lewis v. Oakland County Order of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit C - Pacheco v. Springfield, #5 Exhibit D - Horacek v. Seaman) (Menna, Peter)
October 10, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Menna on behalf of Michael J. Bouchard, Oakland County. (Menna, Peter)
September 12, 2018 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael J. Bouchard* (LGra)
September 12, 2018 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Oakland County* (LGra)
September 11, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Cromer, Ronnie)
September 11, 2018 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Cromer, Ronnie)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6899471 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: OAKLAND - County Where Action Arose: OAKLAND - County of 1st Defendant: OAKLAND. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Cromer, Ronnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Oakland County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Bouchard
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dujuan Keith Rodgers
Represented By: Ronnie E. Cromer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?