State of Michigan Sixth Judicial Circuit Court et al v. El Davis
Plaintiff: Michigan, State of, Quicken Loans, Inc., Trott Law, P.C., State of Michigan Sixth Judicial Circuit Court and Julie A. Krohta
Defendant: Noble Marcus El Davis
Case Number: 2:2018cv12936
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Noble Marcus El Davis. (DPer)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Krohta on behalf of Trott Law, P.C.. (Krohta, Julie)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Krohta on behalf of Julie A. Krohta. (Krohta, Julie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
October 10, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Order to Show Cause on Noble Marcus El Davis,C/O General Delivery, West Bloomfield, MI 48235 (Sandusky, K)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Noble Marcus El Davis to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 10/22/2018 Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Noble Marcus El Davis. (NAhm)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Noble Marcus El Davis. (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Michigan Sixth Judicial Circuit Court et al v. El Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trott Law, P.C.
Represented By: Julie A. Krohta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan Sixth Judicial Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Krohta
Represented By: Julie A. Krohta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Marcus El Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?