United States v. Fichtner
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Megan Fichtner
Case Number: 2:2018cv13081
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Abstract of Judgment by United States as to Megan Fichtner . (Sooy, Thomas)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT as to Megan Fichtner (SSch)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Megan Fichtner* (ATee)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to Megan Fichtner in the amount of $ 2,584.99 by United States. (Sooy, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Megan Fichtner by United States. (Sooy, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Megan Fichtner served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Sooy, Thomas)
October 2, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Megan Fichtner* (DWor)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States against Megan Fichtner. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: USA - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Sooy, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Fichtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Fichtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Thomas L. Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?