Beausoleil v. Snyder et al

Plaintiff: Christine Beausoleil
Defendant: Rick Snyder, Shawn Brewer, Kenneth McKee, Anthony Stewart, Norman Laughlin and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv13139
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Norman Laughlin served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
November 16, 2018 9 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Answer #3 Amended Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 1/4/2019, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
November 1, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Anthony Stewart served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
November 1, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Shawn Brewer served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
November 1, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Heidi Washington served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
November 1, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kenneth McKee served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
November 1, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Governor Rick Snyder served on 10/31/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
October 30, 2018 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christine Beausoleil against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Gordon, Deborah)
October 10, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
October 10, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Shawn Brewer, Norman Laughlin, Kenneth McKee, Rick Snyder, Anthony Stewart, Heidi Washington* (DAll)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Christine Beausoleil against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6937629 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gordon, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beausoleil v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Beausoleil
Represented By: Deborah L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?