Chemical Bank v. 100ZT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chemical Bank
Defendant: Mainstreet Property Group, LLC, 100ZT, LLC, Paul E. Turner and Mainstreet Asset Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13152
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 [Summons that has not been executed docketed as a waiver] WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Paul E. Turner waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Roach, Steven) Modified on 10/31/2018 (LGra).
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 [Summons that has not been executed docketed as a waiver] WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mainstreet Property Group, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Roach, Steven) Modified on 10/31/2018 (LGra).
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 [Summons that has not been executed docketed as a waiver] WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mainstreet Asset Management, Inc. waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Roach, Steven) Modified on 10/31/2018 (LGra).
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 [Summons that has not been executed docketed as a waiver] WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. 100ZT, LLC waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Roach, Steven) Modified on 10/31/2018 (LGra).
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Roach on behalf of Chemical Bank. (Roach, Steven)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *100ZT, LLC, Mainstreet Asset Management, Inc., Mainstreet Property Group, LLC, Paul E. Turner* (DWor)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6938593 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - Business Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Guaranties, #5 Exhibit D - Demand Letter) (Giroux, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemical Bank v. 100ZT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Property Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100ZT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Asset Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemical Bank
Represented By: Erika L. Giroux
Represented By: Steven A. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?