Jennifer Webster PR v. Starfish Family Services et al.

Plaintiff: Jennifer Webster, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Desiree Ann Chase, Deceased
Defendant: David Cardinal, Jr., Jessica Brzys, Shirley Morgan, Cindy Murdock, Starfish Family Services, Inc., Marisa Nicely, Stacy Woods, Gloria Gibson, Jenai Williams and Sieglinde Hendricks
Case Number: 2:2018cv13188
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Avern Cohn
1 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 13 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 3, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sieglinde Hendricks served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gloria Gibson served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stacy Woods served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Shirley Morgan served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jessica Brzys served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jenai Williams served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David Cardinal, Jr. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Cindy Murdock served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Marisa Nicely served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
December 3, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Starfish Family Services, Inc. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
October 15, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
October 15, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (EKar)
October 15, 2018 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Sieglinde Hendricks. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Puzzuoli, Gina)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Gina U. Puzzuoli re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] [NEED TO ADD SIEGLINDE HENDRICKS] (EKar)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jennifer Webster, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Desiree Ann Chase, Deceased against Jennifer Webster, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Desiree Ann Chase, Deceased with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6944426 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Puzzuoli, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennifer Webster PR v. Starfish Family Services et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cardinal, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Brzys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starfish Family Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Nicely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenai Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sieglinde Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Webster, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Desiree Ann Chase, Deceased
Represented By: Gina U. Puzzuoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?