Blanton v. Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC et al
Plaintiff: Harley Blanton
Defendant: Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13207
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #22 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #23 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #24 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, #25 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc. (Leon, Norman)
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc. re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Notice Of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss The Complaint - (Robertson, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits (For Memo), #2 Exhibit A - Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC Standard Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of J. Robert Robertson In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss The Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Unpublished Cases) (Robertson, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 25 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Domino's Pizza, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Domino's Pizza, Inc. for Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Leon, Norman)
December 12, 2018 Filing 24 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Domino's Pizza LLC identifying Corporate Parent Domino's Pizza, Inc. for Domino's Pizza LLC. (Leon, Norman)
December 12, 2018 Filing 23 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC identifying Corporate Parent Domino's Pizza, Inc. for Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC. (Leon, Norman)
December 12, 2018 Filing 22 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC identifying Corporate Parent Domino's Pizza, Inc. for Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC. (Leon, Norman)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Response due by 12/12/2018 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Robertson on behalf of Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Robertson, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Hamill on behalf of Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Hamill, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman M. Leon on behalf of Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Leon, Norman)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David H Bamberger on behalf of Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC, Domino's Pizza LLC, Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Bamberger, David)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint. Response due by 12/10/2018 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Hood on behalf of All Defendants. (Hood, Edward)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter W. Noss on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Noss, Walter)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Hackett on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Hackett, Stephanie)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle E. Conston on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Conston, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Russell on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Russell, Sean)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Miller, E.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Domino's Pizza LLC served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Miller, E.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Domino's Pizza, Inc. served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Miller, E.)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC served on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Miller, E.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. McCune on behalf of Harley Blanton. (McCune, Richard)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Y. Brandt on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Brandt, Derek)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
October 15, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (EKar)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Harley Blanton. (Almonrode, Sharon)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Harley Blanton against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6946398 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw County - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 18-cv-12792, Judge David M. Lawson] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Why Franchise with Dominos, #3 Exhibit 2- DOJ Antitrust Guidance for HR Professionals, #4 Exhibit 3-Health Activists Prepare McDonalds Attack, #5 Exhibit 4-Truth About Wages, #6 Exhibit 5- Why Arent Paychecks Growing, #7 Exhibit 6- Corporate America is Suppressing Wages for Many Workers, #8 Exhibit 7- Join the Dominos Team, #9 Exhibit 8- Hart Research Associates-Key Findings for Survey) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanton v. Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC
Represented By: John R. Robertson
Represented By: John J. Hamill
Represented By: Edward J. Hood
Represented By: David H Bamberger
Represented By: Norman M. Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza LLC
Represented By: John R. Robertson
Represented By: John J. Hamill
Represented By: Edward J. Hood
Represented By: David H Bamberger
Represented By: Norman M. Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza Master Issuer LLC
Represented By: John R. Robertson
Represented By: John J. Hamill
Represented By: Edward J. Hood
Represented By: David H Bamberger
Represented By: Norman M. Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Robertson
Represented By: John J. Hamill
Represented By: Edward J. Hood
Represented By: David H Bamberger
Represented By: Norman M. Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Blanton
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Sean C. Russell
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Derek Y. Brandt
Represented By: Michelle E. Conston
Represented By: Stephanie A. Hackett
Represented By: Richard D. McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?