United States of America v. Currency $69,600

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency $69,600
Case Number: 2:2018cv13251
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael El-Zein on behalf of United States of America. (El-Zein, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Aouate, Linda)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
October 17, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture filed by United States of America against Currency $69,600. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Aouate, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency $69,600
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $69,600
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Linda Aouate
Represented By: Michael El-Zein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?