United States of America v. Mitchell
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: George Mitchell
Case Number: 2:2018cv13295
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT as to George Mitchell (SKra)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *George Mitchell* (SKra)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Judgment by Default with Affidavit of Sum Certain as to George Mitchell in the amount of $ 9,887.30 by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation CLERKS ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT) (Schoenherr, Craig)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to George Mitchell by United States of America. (Schoenherr, Craig)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. George Mitchell served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Schoenherr, Craig)
October 22, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (BGar)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *George Mitchell* (BGar)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against George Mitchell. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: U. S. District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 14-13536, Judge Nancy G. Edmunds] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schoenherr, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig Schoenherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?