Richards v. Koei Tecmo, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kyle Brandon Richards
Defendant: Square Enix, Inc., Koei Tecmo, Inc., Bandai Namco Entertainment and Bethesda Softworks
Case Number: 2:2018cv13300
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kyle Brandon Richards (SSch)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Kyle Brandon Richards. (SSch)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE and Objection to Removal by Kyle Brandon Richards. (SSch)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE remanding case to MONROE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Monroe County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (DPer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Koei Tecmo, Inc. Notice to Remand to the Circuit Court of Monroe County, State of Michigan, for all Further Proceedings (Horton, William)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Koei Tecmo, Inc. of Remand to the Circuit Court of Monroe County, State of Michigan, for all Further Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Horton, William)
October 22, 2018 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Square Enix, Inc., Bandai Namco Entertainment, Bethesda Softworks. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Horton, William)
October 22, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: William H. Horton re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SKra)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Koei Tecmo, Inc. (Horton, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Koei Tecmo, Inc.. (Horton, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Koei Tecmo, Inc. from Monroe County Circuit Court, case number 18-141189-CP. Receipt No: 0645-6957303 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Summons and Complaint-Circuit Court) (Horton, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Koei Tecmo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square Enix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koei Tecmo, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bandai Namco Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethesda Softworks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Brandon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?