Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13309
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 6/10/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/24/2019, Final Settlement Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K)
December 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2018. (Sandusky, K)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. Schefman on behalf of Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC. (Schefman, Bryan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Bennett, Kelli)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Attorney Substitution. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Zapczynski, Jesse)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave proceedings by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Zapczynski, Jesse)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint proceedings by Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC (Schefman, Bryan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave proceedings by Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC (Schefman, Bryan)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of Answer to Complaint proceedings by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Zapczynski, Jesse)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD of COMPLAINT proceedings by Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC (Schefman, Bryan)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Removal #1 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
October 23, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Zapczynski, Jesse)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2018-167247-NF. Receipt No: 0645-6958808 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Zapczynski, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jesse A. Zapczynski
Represented By: Kelli A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Spine and Brain Surgeons, PLLC
Represented By: Bryan L. Schefman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?