Lipian v. University of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Lipian
Defendant: University of Michigan and David Daniels
Case Number: 2:2018cv13321
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Gordon, Deborah)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM filed by David Daniels against Andrew Lipian (Stacey, Francyne)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by David Daniels. (Stacey, Francyne)
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by University of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1. Unpublished Case Law) (Schwartz, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for University of Michigan to File Response to #6 Amended Complaint. Response due by 12/6/2018. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response by Defendant David Daniels to #6 Amended Complaint. Response due by 12/14/2018. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant University of Michigan to File Response to #6 Amended Complaint. Response due by 12/3/2018. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Daniels to File Response to #6 Amended Complaint. Response due by 12/7/2018. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Francyne B. Stacey on behalf of David Daniels. (Stacey, Francyne)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David Daniels served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Schwartz on behalf of University of Michigan. (Schwartz, Brian)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. University of Michigan served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Andrew Lipian against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Gordon, Deborah)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (NAhm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David Daniels served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Gordon, Deborah)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *University of Michigan* (LGra)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *David Daniels* (LGra)
October 25, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Andrew Lipian against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6960642 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gordon, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipian v. University of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lipian
Represented By: Deborah L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Michigan
Represented By: Brian M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Daniels
Represented By: Francyne B. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?