Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Mercyland Health Services, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Mercyland Health Services, PLLC, Stefan Pribil, M.D., Michael Angelo, Cure Imaging, LLC, Joseph Ruefiel, P.T., Omega Rehab Services, LLC, Tox Testing, Inc., Michigan Technology Partners, LLC, Chitra Sinha, M.D., Paragon Labs, LLC, Scan Clear, LLC, Ispine, PLLC, Mohammed Ali Abraham, M.D. a/k/a Mohammed Ali Ibrahim, US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct, Block Billing Solutions, LLC, Prime Rehabilitation Services, LLC, Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc. and Nilesh Patel
Case Number: 2:2018cv13336
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Paul D Borman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Chitra Sinha, M.D. to File Responsive Pleading. Response due by 1/16/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 21, 2018 Filing 35 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wedad Ibrahim appearing on behalf of Chitra Sinha, M.D. (Ibrahim, Wedad)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants ISPINE, PLLC and Stefan Pribil, M.D. to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/9/2018 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 14, 2018 Filing 33 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Michigan Technology Partners, LLC* (SKra)
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michigan Technology Partners, LLC by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to Withdraw Request for Defualt Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (NAhm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 30 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Mercyland Health Services, PLLC* (SKra)
December 6, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Harrison on behalf of Mercyland Health Services, PLLC. (Harrison, Robert)
December 5, 2018 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mercyland Health Services, PLLC by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Harrison on behalf of Mohammed Ali Abraham, M.D. a/k/a Mohammed Ali Ibrahim. (Harrison, Robert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Technology Partners, LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 25 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Cure Imaging, LLC* (DWor)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time FOR DEFENDANTS ISPINE, PLLC and STEFAN PRIBIL, M.D. to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint,,,,,,, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company. Response due by 12/18/2018 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cure Imaging, LLC by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lionel E. Bashore on behalf of Ispine, PLLC, Stefan Pribil, M.D.. (Bashore, Lionel)
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian N. Coote on behalf of Ispine, PLLC, Stefan Pribil, M.D.. (Coote, Ian)
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Cure Imaging, LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct waiver sent on 11/3/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Tox Testing, Inc. waiver sent on 11/3/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Paragon Labs, LLC waiver sent on 11/3/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael Angelo waiver sent on 11/3/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Block Billing Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 11/3/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mercyland Health Services, PLLC served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Mohammed Ali Abraham, M.D. a/k/a Mohammed Ali Ibrahim waiver sent on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ziyad I. Hermiz on behalf of Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc., Nilesh Patel. (Hermiz, Ziyad)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald William Chapman, II appearing on behalf of Chitra Sinha, M.D. (Chapman, Ronald)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Chitra Sinha, M.D. waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Nilesh Patel waiver sent on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Mohammed Ali Abraham, M.D. a/k/a Mohammed Ali Ibrahim, Michael Angelo, Block Billing Solutions, LLC, Cure Imaging, LLC, Ispine, PLLC, Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc., Mercyland Health Services, PLLC, Michigan Technology Partners, LLC, Omega Rehab Services, LLC, Paragon Labs, LLC, Nilesh Patel, Stefan Pribil, M.D., Prime Rehabilitation Services, LLC, Joseph Ruefiel, P.T., Scan Clear, LLC, Chitra Sinha, M.D., Tox Testing, Inc., US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct* (SKra)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. DeNinno on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (DeNinno, Andrew)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company against Mohammed Ali Abraham, M.D. a/k/a Mohammed Ali Ibrahim, Michael Angelo, Block Billing Solutions, LLC, Cure Imaging, LLC, Ispine, PLLC, Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc., Mercyland Health Services, PLLC, Michigan Technology Partners, LLC, Omega Rehab Services, LLC, Paragon Labs, LLC, Nilesh Patel, Stefan Pribil, M.D., Prime Rehabilitation Services, LLC, Joseph Ruefiel, P.T., Scan Clear, LLC, Chitra Sinha, M.D., Tox Testing, Inc., US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6961931 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cook County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Macomb County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #38 Proposed Summonses) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Mercyland Health Services, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercyland Health Services, PLLC
Represented By: Robert S. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan Pribil, M.D.
Represented By: Ian N. Coote
Represented By: Lionel E. Bashore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cure Imaging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ruefiel, P.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Rehab Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tox Testing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Technology Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chitra Sinha, M.D.
Represented By: Wedad Ibrahim
Represented By: Ronald William Chapman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Labs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scan Clear, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ispine, PLLC
Represented By: Ian N. Coote
Represented By: Lionel E. Bashore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Ali Abraham, M.D. a/k/a Mohammed Ali Ibrahim
Represented By: Robert S. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Health Pharmaceuticals, LLC d/b/a Meds Direct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block Billing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Rehabilitation Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livonia Care Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Ziyad I. Hermiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilesh Patel
Represented By: Ziyad I. Hermiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?