SimplexGrinnell LP v. Navigators Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: SimplexGrinnell LP
Defendant: Rock Industries, Inc., Navigators Insurance Company and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13368
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Rock Industries, Inc. (Hart, Erika)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #12 Answer to Complaint by Rock Industries, Inc. (Hart, Erika)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Rock Industries, Inc.. (Hart, Erika)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rock Industries, Inc. served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Norris, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Navigators Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Navigators Group, Inc. for Navigators Insurance Company. (Harb, Omar)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Navigators Insurance Company. (Harb, Omar)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Richter, Gerald)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Richter, Gerald)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Navigators Insurance Company served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Norris, Matthew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Norris, Matthew)
October 30, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Rock Industries, Inc.* (DWor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company* (DWor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Navigators Insurance Company* (DWor)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SimplexGrinnell LP against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6966326 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: oakland - County Where Action Arose: macomb - County of 1st Defendant: oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit) (Norris, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SimplexGrinnell LP v. Navigators Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SimplexGrinnell LP
Represented By: Matthew C. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Erika D. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: Omar J. Harb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Gerald J. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?