Oakland Tactical Supply, LLC et al v. Howell Township

Plaintiff: Oakland Tactical Supply, LLC, Scott Fresh, Jason Raines and Matthew Remenar
Defendant: Howell Township
Case Number: 2:2018cv13443
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN. (JCur)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Howell Township. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Reliance on Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Meagher, Thomas)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER granting a Second Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 . Response due by 12/21/2018. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION (Second) for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Howell Township (Meagher, Thomas)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting First Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading To Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 . Response due by 12/14/2018 Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Civil Complaint by Howell Township (Meagher, Thomas)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Meagher on behalf of Howell Township. (Meagher, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Howell Township served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Hagerty, Matthew)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Brennan on behalf of Howell Township. (Brennan, John)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William K. Fahey on behalf of Howell Township. (Fahey, William)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Patterson on behalf of Howell Township. (Patterson, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Howell Township* (LGra)
November 5, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6975329 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Livingston. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hagerty, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakland Tactical Supply, LLC et al v. Howell Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakland Tactical Supply, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Fresh
Represented By: Matthew M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Raines
Represented By: Matthew M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Remenar
Represented By: Matthew M. Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howell Township
Represented By: John S. Brennan
Represented By: Christopher S. Patterson
Represented By: William K. Fahey
Represented By: Thomas R. Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?