Magyar et al v. United States Postal Service et al

Plaintiff: Linda Magyar and Klay Magyar
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers and its Michigan Affiliate, Branch 1, John Dickerson, United States Postal Service, Megan J. Brennan, Lashiba Tarrance, Carl Blassingame, Jr. and Adrana Jones
Case Number: 2:2018cv13447
Filed: November 4, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Avern Cohn
1 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2018 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Carl Blassingame, Jr. waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; John Dickerson waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019; National Association of Letter Carriers and its Michigan Affiliate, Branch 1 waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Akhtar, Jamil)
December 27, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Attorney served on 11/21/18. (Akhtar, Jamil)
December 26, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. United States Postal Service served on 11/29/18. (Akhtar, Jamil)
December 26, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Office of Attorney General served on 11/21/18. (Akhtar, Jamil)
December 26, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. MeganBrennan served on 11/29/18. (Akhtar, Jamil)
November 5, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
November 5, 2018 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DWor)
November 5, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
November 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6975627 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Akhtar, Jamil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magyar et al v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Letter Carriers and its Michigan Affiliate, Branch 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashiba Tarrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Blassingame, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrana Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Magyar
Represented By: Jamil Akhtar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klay Magyar
Represented By: Jamil Akhtar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?