Clemons v. Williams

Plaintiff: Richard Clemons
Defendant: J. Williams
Case Number: 2:2018cv13468
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Denise Page Hood
1 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding deficient service documents (LGra)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 COPY of #4 Notice mailed to Richard Clemons and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
November 21, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #6 Directing Service by the US Marshal on Richard Clemons at 42 West Warren, Suite 257, Detroit, MI 48202. (JOwe)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Richard Clemons. (SSch)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Clemons against J. Williams (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?