Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited v. Twin-Star International Inc.,
Plaintiff: Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited
Defendant: Twin-Star International Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2018cv13504
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Avern Cohn
2 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
3 Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara L. Mandell on behalf of Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited. (Mandell, Barbara)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Twin-Star International Inc.,* (SKra)
December 7, 2018 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Twin-Star International Inc.,. (Stewart, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited against Twin-Star International Inc.,. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Cohn Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Normand Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - McDermott Slides) (Stewart, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Avern Cohn and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited (Stewart, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Stewart, Michael)
November 13, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Michael B. Stewart. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Other Relief and Demand for Trial by Jury filed by Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited against Twin-Star International Inc., with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-6985167 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Outside of Michigan - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Outside of Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 2:18-cv-11842-AC-MKM, Judge Avern Cohn] (Stewart, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited v. Twin-Star International Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd., f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited
Represented By: Michael B. Stewart
Represented By: Barbara L. Mandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin-Star International Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?