Tech and Goods, Inc. v. 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tech and Goods, Inc.
Defendant: 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC, TOOLETRIES PTY. LTD. and TOOLETRIES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv13516
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
1 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Dismissal for lack of personal jurisdiction by TOOLETRIES PTY. LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Schooff, George)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Tech and Goods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of J Barber for Response to Show Cause, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - MN Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - motion to dismiss MN, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration fo Carson LaFavers iso PJ motion) (Barber, Joseph)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Tech and Goods, Inc. to Show Cause why Case should not be Transferred and Consolidated: Show Cause Response due by 12/14/2018. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC (McDaniel, David)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Ryan Walther, #3 Exhibit A-Amazon Notice of Complaint 9/22/2018, #4 Exhibit B-Amazon Notice of Complaint 9/22/2018, #5 Exhibit C-Letter received 9/24/2018, #6 Exhibit D-Letter sent 9/26/2018, #7 Exhibit E-Letter received 9/28/2018, #8 Exhibit F-Amazon Notice of Complaint 10/3/2018, #9 Exhibit G-Petition to Cancel filed with TTAB 10/10/2018, #10 Exhibit H-Complaint filed with District of MN 10/25/2018, #11 Exhibit I-Motion filed with TTAB 11/19/2018, #12 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Daniel Ready, #13 Exhibit J-Business Search for Tech and Goods in Georgia, #14 Exhibit K-UPS Store's Decatur, GA website, #15 Exhibit L-Delaware Dept of State search for Amazon, #16 Exhibit M-Amazon's website page of 12/4/2018, #17 Exhibit N-State Bar Report re attorney fees 12/3/2018) (McDaniel, David)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER For Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint or otherwise Plead (Response due by 1/5/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. TOOLETRIES, LLC served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Barber, Joseph)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. TOOLETRIES PTY. LTD. served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Barber, Joseph)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Barber, Joseph)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC, TOOLETRIES PTY. LTD., TOOLETRIES, LLC* (SKra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew M. Grove appearing on behalf of Tech and Goods, Inc. (Grove, Andrew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Barber, Joseph)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tech and Goods, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6985765 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: DeKalb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Hennepin. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): USDC District of Minnesota, Division 3 - St. Paul, 0:18-cv-03013, Judge Erickson] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 7, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barber, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tech and Goods, Inc. v. 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 30 WATT HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: David S. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOOLETRIES PTY. LTD.
Represented By: George T. Schooff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOOLETRIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech and Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W. Barber, I
Represented By: Andrew M. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?