Rockford Bank and Trust v. Tricon Security Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rockford Bank and Trust
Defendant: Tricon Security Group, LLC and Michael C. Whittaker
Case Number: 2:2018cv13529
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kimberly Moehle appearing on behalf of Rockford Bank and Trust (Moehle, Kimberly)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Michael C. Whittaker. (Schneider, Peter)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Tricon Security Group, LLC. (Borin, Howard)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Lockhart, Jeremy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Michael C. Whittaker* (SKra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Tricon Security Group, LLC * (SKra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Rockford Bank and Trust identifying Corporate Parent QCR Holdings, Inc. for Rockford Bank and Trust. (Lockhart, Jeremy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rockford Bank and Trust against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6987830 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Winnebago County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Lockhart, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockford Bank and Trust v. Tricon Security Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricon Security Group, LLC
Represented By: Howard Borin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Whittaker
Represented By: Peter F. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockford Bank and Trust
Represented By: Jeremy David Lockhart
Represented By: Kimberly Moehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?