CBS Boring & Machine Co. Inc. v. Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH

Plaintiff: CBS Boring & Machine Co. Inc.
Defendant: Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH
Case Number: 2:2018cv13623
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Forum Non Conveniens. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Forum Non Conveniens filed by Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: Eisenwerk Bruhl Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit B: Dr. Martin Reufels Declaration, #4 Exhibit C: Peter Kranz Declaration) (Taylor, Maureen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH. (Taylor, Maureen)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Reply as #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Forum Non Conveniens: Reply due by 1/10/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Reply Brief Deadline by Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH (Taylor, Maureen)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Forum Non Conveniens PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER FORUM NON CONVENIENS filed by CBS Boring & Machine Co. Inc.. (DeLine, James)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Forum Non Conveniens by Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A: 4/19/16 Purchase Agreement) (Taylor, Maureen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH (Taylor, Maureen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel N. Sharkey on behalf of Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH. (Sharkey, Daniel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. DeLine on behalf of CBS Boring & Machine Co. Inc.. (DeLine, James)
November 21, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2018-001887-CB. Receipt No: 0645-6998120 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: Macomb County Circuit Court Docket, #3 Exhibit 2: Summons and Complaint and German Translation, #4 Exhibit 3: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Macomb County Circuit Court)) (Taylor, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CBS Boring & Machine Co. Inc. v. Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisenwerk Bruhl GmbH
Represented By: Maureen T. Taylor
Represented By: Daniel N. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBS Boring & Machine Co. Inc.
Represented By: James E. DeLine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?