Spence v. Commissionerof Social Security

Plaintiff: Karl Lee Spence
Defendant: Commissionerof Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv13625
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Avern Cohn
1 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, by Karl Lee Spence (Robison, Charles)
December 13, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Sonia on behalf of Commissionerof Social Security. (Sonia, Nicole)
November 30, 2018 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Commissionerof Social Security* (ATee)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs --Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
November 21, 2018 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (LGra)
November 21, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
November 20, 2018 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Karl Lee Spence. (Robison, Charles)
November 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Karl Lee Spence against Commissionerof Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Robison, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spence v. Commissionerof Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissionerof Social Security
Represented By: Nicole Sonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Lee Spence
Represented By: Charles A. Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?