Operation Unification Inc et al v. Gennsee County Municipality et al

Plaintiff: Charles Young, Jr., Lelsa McGee-Harvey, Charles Young Group, Operation Unification Inc and Lela McGee-Harvey
Defendant: Genesee County Treasurer, Genesee County Employees, Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Subsidiaries and Affiliates and Gennsee County Municipality
Case Number: 2:2018cv13779
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Terrence G Berg
1 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 12 REPLY to #11 Response (Free) of Plaintiffs' to Actions of Circuit Court Judge by Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Stowers, Rhonda)
January 24, 2019 11 RESPONSE to Actions of Circuit Court Judge by Charles Young, Jr. (NAhm)
January 17, 2019 10 REPLY to Response re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality. (Stowers, Rhonda)
January 17, 2019 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda R. Stowers on behalf of Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality. (Stowers, Rhonda)
January 7, 2019 8 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to dismiss filed by plaintiffs. (DPer)
December 28, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - LARA Corporate records) (Forbush, Audrey)
December 28, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey J. Forbush on behalf of Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality. (Forbush, Audrey)
December 20, 2018 5 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
December 11, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on All Plaintiffs at G5262 N Saginaw St, Flint, MI 48505. (AChu)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
December 6, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Genesee County Circuit Court, Genesee County Employees, Genesee County Subsidiaries and Affiliates, Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality* (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation) (SSch)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lelsa McGee-Harvey, Charles Young, Jr against Genesee County Treasurer, Gennsee County Municipality, John Doe, Operation Unification Inc Receipt No: DET118766 - Fee: $ 400. (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operation Unification Inc et al v. Gennsee County Municipality et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lelsa McGee-Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Young Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operation Unification Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela McGee-Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Treasurer
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Represented By: Rhonda R. Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Circuit Court
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Represented By: Rhonda R. Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Subsidiaries and Affiliates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gennsee County Municipality
Represented By: Audrey J. Forbush
Represented By: Rhonda R. Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?