Dhadphale et al v. Delaney

Plaintiff: Aniket Dhadphale and FBO Christopher Westfall IRA
Defendant: Joseph Delaney, D. Scott Eshelman and Brett J Runkel
Case Number: 2:2018cv13780
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Joseph Delaney. (Mucha, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim for Fraud by Joseph Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Operating Agreement) (Mucha, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued for *Brett J Runkel* (SOso)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued for *D. Scott Eshelman* (SOso)
January 11, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for D. Scott Eshelman, Brett J Runkel. (Sprovtsoff, Jessica)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Aniket Dhadphale, FBO Christopher Westfall IRA against Joseph Delaney, Brett J Runkel, D. Scott Eshelman. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Sprovtsoff, Jessica)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Aniket Dhadphale, FBO Christopher Westfall IRA against Joseph Delaney. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Sprovtsoff, Jessica)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, and DENYING AS MOOT #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and/or Plaintiffs' Claim for Fraud. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
January 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Terrence G. Berg: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/9/2019 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (AChu)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Aniket Dhadphale, FBO Christopher Westfall IRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Sprovtsoff, Jessica)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Sprovtsoff, Jessica)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and/or Plaintiffs' Claim for Fraud filed by Joseph Delaney. Response due by 1/10/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina M. Abboud on behalf of Joseph Delaney. (Abboud, Nina)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Joseph Delaney. (Mucha, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and/or Plaintiffs' Claim for Fraud by Joseph Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Mucha, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Earl R. Johnson on behalf of Joseph Delaney. (Johnson, Earl)
December 7, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joseph Delaney from Washtenaw County Circuit Court, case number 18-854-NZ. Receipt No: 0645-7017683 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Document Continuation Proof of Service) (Mucha, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dhadphale et al v. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Delaney
Represented By: John Mucha, III
Represented By: Nina M. Abboud
Represented By: Earl R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Eshelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett J Runkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aniket Dhadphale
Represented By: Jessica A. Sprovtsoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FBO Christopher Westfall IRA
Represented By: Jessica A. Sprovtsoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?