Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Isselhardt Automotive, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Defendant: Isselhardt Automotive, LLC and Tracy Isselhardt
Case Number: 2:2018cv13804
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Weikert, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint, (Response due by 2/4/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Weikert on behalf of Tracy Isselhardt, Isselhardt Automotive, LLC. (Weikert, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Possession of Vehicle Inventory and Granting #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Immediate Possession of Collateral; and Cancelling Motion Hearing on 12/18/2018 re #10 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Hearing on #3 MOTION for Immediate Possession of Collateral, (Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2018 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Immediate Possession of Collateral by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Bruinsma, James)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Tracy Isselhardt served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Bruinsma, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Immediate Possession of Collateral by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Bruinsma, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Isselhardt Automotive, LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Bruinsma, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Tracy Isselhardt* (DPer)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Isselhardt Automotive, LLC* (DPer)
December 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Immediate Possession of Collateral by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Hugh Johnson) (Bruinsma, James)[AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION] Modified on 12/10/2018 (DPer).
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nissan North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co, Ltd., Corporate Parent Renault S.A. for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Bruinsma, James)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED filed by All Plaintiffs against Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7020618 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Wholesale Financing Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Financing Statement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Guaranty, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Demand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Schedule of Vehicles) (Bruinsma, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation v. Isselhardt Automotive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isselhardt Automotive, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Weikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Isselhardt
Represented By: Michael J. Weikert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: James R. Bruinsma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?