Steele v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Shane Steele
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13946
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Norfolk Southern Railway Company answer due 3/15/2019. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clark, Kathryn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clark, Kathryn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn S. Clark on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Clark, Kathryn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin D. Foley on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Foley, Erin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Paul, Gregory)
December 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Norfolk Southern Railway Company* (DWor)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shane Steele against Norfolk Southern Railway Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7035483 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of state - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Paul, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Kathryn S. Clark
Represented By: Erin D. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Steele
Represented By: Gregory G. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?