Schaaf et al v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Schaaf and Susan Schaaf
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, Citibank, N.A., Trans Union, LLC, First National Bank of Omaha, Bank of America, N.A., Comenity, LLC and Ally Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13999
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint *as to Citibank, N.A* (Responsive Pleading due by 3/8/19). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 12, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Amy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ally Financial, Inc.. (Ostroff, Ethan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Comenity, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SECOND STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint *as to Synchrony Bank.* (Responsive Pleading due by 2/22/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 17, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. First National Bank of Omaha served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 17, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant, Bank of America to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 3/1/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint *as to Synchrony Bank.* (Responsive Pleading due by 2/1/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan J. Taylor on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Taylor, Alan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Kolkmeyer on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by First National Bank of Omaha. (Rooney, Cory)
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Bank of America, N.A. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Poling, Colin)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time for Defendant Ally Financial, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Responsive Pleading due by 2/7/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 7, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by First National Bank of Omaha (Rooney, Cory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT to Removal by First National Bank of Omaha (Rooney, Cory)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Ally Financial, Inc. (Ostroff, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ally Financial, Inc. (Ostroff, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc.. (Ostroff, Ethan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Kundmueller on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc.. (Kundmueller, Mark)
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of Comenity, LLC. (King, Stephen)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Trans Union, LLC re #11 Order Trans Union, LLC's Notice Of Filing Notice Of Removal With The United States District Court (Poling, Colin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Comenity, LLC., to File Responsive Pleading (Responsive Pleading for Comenity, LLC., is due 1/29/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Comenity, LLC (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (AGREED) by Comenity, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to Removal by Comenity, LLC (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna-Katrina S. Christakis on behalf of Comenity, LLC. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory J. Rooney on behalf of First National Bank of Omaha. (Rooney, Cory)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin C. Poling on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Poling, Colin)
December 23, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Lehmann, Andrew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lehmann on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Lehmann, Andrew)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from 35th District Court, State of Michigan, case number 18T5136GC. Receipt No: 0645-7040757 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons to Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint to Trans Union, LLC) (Lehmann, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaaf et al v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Schaaf
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Schaaf
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Alan J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lehmann
Represented By: Colin C. Poling
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Cory J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity, LLC
Represented By: Stephen W. King
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S. Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Kundmueller
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?