AUTO KONNECT, LLC v. BMW of North America, LLC , et al

Plaintiff: AUTO KONNECT, LLC
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC and Does 1 - 10
Case Number: 2:2018cv14019
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Gershwin A Drain
1 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Answer to Complaint, #9 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations by BMW of North America, LLC (Hage, Paul)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by BMW of North America, LLC (Hage, Paul)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by BMW of North America, LLC. (Hage, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint re #5 Stipulation, ( Response due by 1/23/2019). Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Hage on behalf of BMW of North America, LLC. (Hage, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Entry of Order Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by BMW of North America, LLC (Hage, Paul)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. BMW of North America, LLC served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Plunkett, David)[SERVED 12/27/18] Modified on 1/3/2019 (DPer).
December 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *BMW of North America, LLC* (ATee)
December 23, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by AUTO KONNECT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AUTO KONNECT, LLC for AUTO KONNECT, LLC. (Plunkett, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by AUTO KONNECT, LLC against BMW of North America, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7042150 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Bergen. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Plunkett, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AUTO KONNECT, LLC v. BMW of North America, LLC , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTO KONNECT, LLC
Represented By: David E. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Hage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?