Marshall v. Steeh et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Lamar Marshall
Defendant: Michigan Department of Human Services, George Caram Steeh, Bernard A. Friedman and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018mc51570
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Terrence G Berg
1 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE from Miscellaneous Docket to Civil Docket [New Civil Number: 18-13706] Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SSch)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Supplement Motion for Immediate Consideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Darrell Lamar Marshall. (ATee)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Darrell Lamar Marshall. (DPer)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Darrell Lamar Marshall. (DPer)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darrell Lamar Marshall against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Steeh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Caram Steeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard A. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Lamar Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?