General Motors Corp Air Conditioning Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Plaintiff: Richard Northcutt, Steven Manning, Hayes Ellis, Lauren Heiser, Carl Williams, Corey Steketee, Edilberto Gomez, RONALD GAVALDON, Andrew Hill, Ryan Jenkins, Jan Howard, Leslie Griffin, Marcus Bell, Thomas L Brennan, Clarence Larry, William Taylor, Matthew Dexter, Eric Pitre, Christopher Humpherys, Robert Valles, Jr, Nathan Dodge, Christopher Robitsek, Mohamed Tangara, Billy Frank, Richie Ainsworth, Erica Wolfe, Aaron Howard, Kenneth Gay, Rodney Martin, Jenni Davis, Jones Won, John O'Brien, Rick Miller, Kevin Blagg, Yamet Garcia and Robert Davis
Defendant: General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors Company and General Motors LLC
In Re: General Motors Corp Air Conditioning Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Case Number: 2:2018md02818
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Leitman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's #35 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #56 MOTION re #43 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Jenni Davis, Ryan Jenkins, Rick Miller, Eric Pitre, Richie Ainsworth, Steven Manning, Robert Davis, Lauren Heiser, Robert Valles, Jr, John O'Brien, Carl Williams, Thomas L Brennan, Mohamed Tangara, Matthew Dexter, Rodney Martin, Jones Won, Christopher Robitsek, Clarence Larry, Kenneth Gay, RONALD GAVALDON, Edilberto Gomez, Aaron Howard, Kevin Blagg, Jan Howard, Corey Steketee, Andrew Hill, Leslie Griffin, Yamet Garcia, Marcus Bell, Billy Frank, Nathan Dodge, Richard Northcutt, Hayes Ellis, Christopher Humpherys, Erica Wolfe, William Taylor. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 30, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by All Defendants re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dawson v. Gen. Motors LLC) (Coleman, Hayden)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting #57 Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 26, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Coleman, Hayden)
July 3, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION re #43 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Miller, E.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION TO DISMISS AND STATUS CONFERENCE held on June 25, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 106) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
June 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2019 re #35 MOTION to Dismiss; Status Conference held on 6/25/2019. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
June 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (IN PERSON Status Conference RESET for 6/25/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman), (Motion Hearing re #35 MOTION to Dismiss RESET for 6/25/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) (HMon)
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss. (Motion Hearing and In Person Status Conference RESET for 6/25/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) (HMon)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER of Withdrawal of Guyon H. Knight as Counsel of Record for Defendant. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 19, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Daniel J. LaCombe for on behalf of All Defendants. (LaCombe, Daniel)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER of Withdrawal of Dennis A. Lienhardt as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 17, 2019 Attorney Dennis A. Lienhardt is discontinued from receiving Notices of Electronic Filing. Reason: No Longer Associated with The Miller Law Firm, P.C.Withdrawn as Counsel for Plaintiffs. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
April 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs to Withdraw Dennis A. Lienhardt as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs (Almonrode, Sharon)
April 17, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: (IN PERSON Status Conference RESET for 6/18/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman,) Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss. (Motion Hearing RESET for 6/18/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) (HMon)
March 22, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: IN PERSON Status Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing RESET for 5/16/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 14, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kalas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kalas, William)
March 12, 2019 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE held on March 11, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 54) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: IN PERSON Status Conference held on 3/11/2019. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
February 15, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE TO APPEAR: IN PERSON Status Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF HEARING on #35 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 30, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Coleman, Hayden)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED ORDER Extending the Deadline for Submission of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their #35 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 1/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 24, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: In Person Status Conference on 1/28/2019 is Cancelled re #39 Notice to Appear. To be rescheduled at a later date. (HMon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Amisha Patel on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Patel, Amisha)
January 14, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Unpublished Cases, #3 Exhibit 2-10/15/2017 Letter to GM Counsel Craig Glidden) (Miller, E.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED ORDER Extending the Page Limit for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' #35 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 3, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Laura B. Heiman by Billy Frank, Yamet Garcia, Ryan Jenkins, John O'Brien, Corey Steketee, Carl Williams. (Martin, Annika)
December 19, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE TO APPEAR: IN PERSON Status Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 11, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Yeary on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Yeary, Michelle)
December 5, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel O. Herrera on behalf of Edilberto Gomez, Leslie Griffin, Rodney Martin. (Herrera, Daniel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2018. (Court Reporter: Carol Harrison) (Number of Pages: 18) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 12/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (CHar)
November 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/20/2018. (Court Reporter: Carol Harrison) (HMon)
November 13, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by General Motors Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Coleman, Hayden)
November 13, 2018 Filing 34 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC, and General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Coleman, Hayden)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED ESI ORDER. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #31 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by General Motors LLC, General Motors Holdings LLC, and General Motors Company. Opening brief shall be no more than 50 pages and reply brief shall be no more than 20 pages. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #32 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limitation filed by General Motors LLC, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors Company. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 30, 2018 Filing 32 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limitation by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Coleman, Hayden)
October 30, 2018 Filing 31 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Coleman, Hayden)
October 29, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Page on behalf of Clarence Larry. (Page, Kevin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayden A. Coleman on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC. (Coleman, Hayden)
October 19, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 11/20/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **CALL-IN INFORMATION WILL BE PROVIDED VIA E-MAIL** (HMon)
October 15, 2018 Filing 28 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 5) (SSch)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanon J. Carson on behalf of Clarence Larry. (Carson, Shanon)
September 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen L. Abramson on behalf of Clarence Larry. (Abramson, Glen)
August 24, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: IN PERSON Status Conference RESET for 10/22/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. In Person Status Conference scheduled for 9/17/2018 at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. (HMon)
August 14, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-TSB PIE0340, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Yamet Garcia, #4 Exhibit C-Cadillac Counsel Notes 2014, #5 Exhibit D-November 2017 Notice Letter, #6 Exhibit E-Declaration of Carl E. Williams, #7 Exhibit F-Consumer Complaint May 2017, #8 Exhibit G-Consumer Complaint May 2016, #9 Exhibit H-Consumer Complaint September 2016, #10 Exhibit I-Consumer Complaint June 2017, #11 Exhibit J-Consumer Complaint August 4, 2014, #12 Exhibit K-Consumer Complaint September 27, 2014, #13 Exhibit L-Consumer Complaint October 29, 2014, #14 Exhibit M-Consumer Complaint April/June 2017, #15 Exhibit N-Consumer Complaint May 2017, #16 Exhibit O-Consumer Complaint August 17, 2014, #17 Exhibit P-Consumer Complaint June 2017, #18 Exhibit Q-Consumer Complaint March 2017, #19 Exhibit R-Consumer Complaint June 2017, #20 Exhibit S-Preliminary Information Bulletin #PIT5331, #21 Exhibit T-GM Parts Direct-Hose, #22 Exhibit U-Media GM, #23 Exhibit V-GM Authority, #24 Exhibit W-Media GM, #25 Exhibit X-GM Authority, #26 Exhibit Y-Preliminary Information Bulletin #PIT5331, #27 Exhibit Z-Consumer Complaint August 16, 2014, #28 Exhibit AA-Consumer Complaint August 17, 2014, #29 Exhibit BB-Consumer Complaint August 4, 2014, #30 Exhibit CC-Consumer Complaint September 27, 2014, #31 Exhibit DD-Consumer Complaint June 2, 2017, #32 Exhibit EE-Consumer Complaint March 22, 20017, #33 Exhibit FF-Consumer Complaint September 17, 2016, #34 Exhibit GG-Consumer Complaint July 25, 2017, #35 Exhibit HH-Torque News, #36 Exhibit II-Consumer Complaint #10994603, #37 Exhibit JJ-Consumer Complaint #11010471, #38 Exhibit KK-Consumer Complaint August 5, 2017, #39 Exhibit LL-Consumer Complaint June 7, 2017, #40 Exhibit MM-Consumer Complaint March 24, 2015, #41 Exhibit NN-Consumer Complaint July 4, 2017, #42 Exhibit OO-Consumer Complaint June 13, 2017, #43 Exhibit PP-17336-02 Special Coverage) (Miller, E.)
July 19, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: IN PERSON Status Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. In Person Status Conference scheduled for 7/23/2018 is CANCELLED. (HMon)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED ORDER to Amend the Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/26/2018. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon)
June 25, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED VIA E-MAIL TO JOIN THE CALL** (HMon)
June 6, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: IN PERSON Status Conference RESET for 7/23/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. In Person Status Conference scheduled for 6/14/2018 is CANCELLED. (HMon)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Deadlines to Serve and Respond to Defendants' Meet and Confer Letter. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 2, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION TO EXTEND Time to Serve Meet and Confer Letter re #14 Scheduling Order, by All Defendants. (Knight, Guyon)
May 23, 2018 Filing 20 COPY of #19 Order mailed to Cory S. Fein and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Protocol for Common Benefit Work and Expenses. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 7, 2018 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiffs Rodney Martin, Clarence Larry, Leslie Griffin, Edilberto Gomez, Corey Steketee. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #18 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, (Miller, E.)
May 4, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Consolidated Master Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - TSB PIE0340, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Yamet Garcia, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Cadillac Counsel Notes 2014, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - November 2017 Notice Letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of Carl E. Williams, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Consumer Complaint May 2017, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Consumer Complaint May 2017, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Consumer Complaint September 2016, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Consumer Complaint June 2017, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - Consumer Complaint August 4, 2014, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Consumer Complaint September 27, 2014, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L - Consumer Complaint October 29, 2014, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M - Consumer Complaint April/June 2017, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N - Consumer Complaint May 2017, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O - Consumer Complaint August 17, 2014, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P - Consumer Complaint June 2017, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Consumer Complaint March 2017, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R - Consumer Complaint June 2017, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S - Preliminary Information Bulletin #PIT5331, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T - GM Parts Direct-Hose, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U - Media GM- GM Milford Proving Ground Milestone Birthday, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V - GM Authority- GM Celebrates 90 Years of Vehicle Testing, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W - Media GM- GM Milford Proving Ground Milestone Birthday, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X - GM Authority- 2014 Silverados Benefit from 12.5 Million Miles of Durability Testing, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Y - GM Authority- 2014 Silverados Benefit from 12.5 Million Miles of Durability Testing, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Z - Consumer Complaint August 16, 2014, #28 Exhibit Exhibit AA - Consumer Complaint August 17, 2014, #29 Exhibit Exhibit BB - Consumer Complaint August 17, 2014, #30 Exhibit Exhibit CC - Consumer Complaint September 27, 2014, #31 Exhibit Exhibit DD - Consumer Complaint September 27, 2014, #32 Exhibit Exhibit EE - Consumer Complaint March 22, 2017, #33 Exhibit Exhibit FF - Consumer Complaint September 17, 2016, #34 Exhibit Exhibit GG - Consumer Complaint July 25, 2017, #35 Exhibit Exhibit HH - Torque News-Owners of 2014 Chevy Silverados Furious, #36 Exhibit Exhibit II - Consumer Complaint #10994603, #37 Exhibit Exhibit JJ - Consumer Complaint #11010471, #38 Exhibit Exhibit KK - Consumer Complaint August 5, 2017, #39 Exhibit Exhibit LL - Consumer Complaint June 7, 2017, #40 Exhibit Exhibit MM - Consumer Complaint March 24, 2015, #41 Exhibit Exhibit NN - Consumer Complaint July 4, 2017, #42 Exhibit Exhibit OO - Consumer Complaint June 13, 2017, #43 Exhibit Exhibit PP - 17336-02 Special Coverage) (Miller, E.)[FILING ERROR: NEW PARTIES ADDED] Modified on 5/7/2018 (DPer).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER to Amend the Initial Scheduling Order to Extend the Deadline to Exchange Initial Disclosures. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 25, 2018 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE held on April 10, 2018. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 67) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Goodrich, P)
April 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Annika K. Martin on behalf of Billy Frank, Yamet Garcia, Ryan Jenkins, John O'Brien, Carl Williams. (Martin, Annika)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/14/2018 at 9:30 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (HMon)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (1) Appointing Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel and (2) Setting Date for Objections to Common Benefit Work and Expenses Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 4/10/2018. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon)
April 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Thomas L Brennan, Lauren Heiser, Christopher Humpherys, Mohamed Tangara, Erica Wolfe re #9 Application, Supplement to Joint Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel, by E.Powell Miller, Bryan Clobes, Annika K. Martin and Joseph Sauder (Miller, E.)
April 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Vess A. Miller on behalf of Kenneth Gay. (Miller, Vess)
April 3, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Kevin Blagg, Jenni Davis, Matthew Dexter, Nathan Dodge, Hayes Ellis, RONALD GAVALDON, Andrew Hill, Steven Manning, William Taylor, Robert Valles, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RESUME OF DENNIS REICH) (Schechter, Richard)
April 3, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Thomas L Brennan, Lauren Heiser, Christopher Humpherys, Mohamed Tangara, Erica Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Miller Law Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 2 - Martin Declaration with Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 3 - Clobes Law Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sauder Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit 5 - Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
April 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Joint Preliminary Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Motors Company Subsidiaries and Joint Ventures) (Miller, E.)
April 3, 2018 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY REPORT RE PLAINTIFFS' LEADERSHIP TEAM by Jenni Davis, Nathan Dodge, Hayes Ellis, RONALD GAVALDON, Andrew Hill, Steven Manning, William Taylor, Robert Valles, Jr (Schechter, Richard)
March 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by General Motors LLC Notice of Prior Firm Affiliation (LaCombe, Daniel)
March 23, 2018 Filing 5 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3) (SSch)
March 14, 2018 Filing 4 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2) (SSch)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CONFERENCE. Conference set for 4/10/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (ATee)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) (SSch)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1 Transfer Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 USC 1407, that the actions listed pending outside the Eastern District of Michigan are transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan, creating MDL 2818 (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Motors Corp Air Conditioning Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: General Motors Corp Air Conditioning Marketing and Sales Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Northcutt
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Manning
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayes Ellis
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Heiser
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Williams
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Steketee
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edilberto Gomez
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD GAVALDON
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hill
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Jenkins
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Howard
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Griffin
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Bell
Represented By: Cory S. Fein
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L Brennan
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Larry
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Kevin Page
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Taylor
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Dexter
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Pitre
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Humpherys
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Valles, Jr
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Dodge
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Robitsek
Represented By: Cory S. Fein
Represented By: Benjamin F Johns
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Tangara
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Patrick E. Cafferty
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Frank
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richie Ainsworth
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Wolfe
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Bryan L. Clobes
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Howard
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gay
Represented By: James P. Allen
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Represented By: Vess A. Miller
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Martin
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenni Davis
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones Won
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O'Brien
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan D. Selbin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Miller
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Blagg
Represented By: Richard M. Schechter
Represented By: Dennis C. Reich
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamet Garcia
Represented By: Annika K. Martin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: William Kalas
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Holdings LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Amisha Patel
Represented By: Michelle Yeary
Represented By: Guyon H. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Daniel J. LaCombe
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Amisha Patel
Represented By: Michelle Yeary
Represented By: Guyon H. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Daniel J. LaCombe
Represented By: Hayden A. Coleman
Represented By: Amisha Patel
Represented By: Michelle Yeary
Represented By: Guyon H. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?