Honey, Jr. v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlton Honey, Jr.
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Prosper Marketplace, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, TD Bank, N.A., First National Bank of Omaha, Bank of America, N.A. and American Express
Case Number: 2:2019cv10042
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Refund of Fees. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 [LETTER] MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James) Modified on 2/19/2019 (LGra).
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from 17th District Court of receipt of #11 Notice of remand. (DPer)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE remanding case to 17TH DISTRICT COURT. (DPer)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REMANDING CASE to 17th District Court. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Kolkmeyer on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Bank of America, N.A. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Rang on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Rang, Laura)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Policchio on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from 17th District Court, MI, case number 18-75215-GC. Receipt No: 0645-7053525 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint To Trans Union, LLC) (Policchio, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honey, Jr. v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Honey, Jr.
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: James L. Policchio
Represented By: Laura K. Rang
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?