Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World v. Riley et al

Plaintiff: Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World
Defendant: Jan Mark Land, Melvin Riley, John Eaton, Daniel Dillman and Renee Atkins
Case Number: 2:2019cv10062
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF HEARING on #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively, to Transfer This Action, Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
March 5, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF HEARING on #24 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting #38 Motion for Leave to File to File Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limit. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (MacKay, K)
February 26, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response re #38 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief in Support, Reply Brief Sought to be Filed and Certificate of Service, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively, to Transfer This Action, Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service filed by Daniel Dillman. (Kraatz, Carina)
February 26, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief in Support, Reply Brief Sought to be Filed and Certificate of Service by Daniel Dillman. (Kraatz, Carina)
February 25, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Opposition to Motion filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit By-Laws, #3 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #4 Exhibit Cease and desist letter, #5 Exhibit Advertisements in violation of Injunction) (Orlando, Lisa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Opposition to Motion filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Facebook post BAL theatre, #3 Exhibit Pictures on stage, #4 Exhibit Facebook Compilation, #5 Exhibit Instagram Compilation, #6 Exhibit Twitter Compilation, #7 Exhibit Music credits) (Orlando, Lisa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Opposition to Motion filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit By-Laws, #3 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #4 Exhibit Shareholders Agreement, #5 Exhibit Email from Riley, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Terry Harvey, #7 Exhibit Letter to Riley, #8 Exhibit Emails from Riley to promoters, #9 Exhibit Cease and Desist) (Orlando, Lisa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Opposition to Motion filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Atkins Facebook as publicist, #3 Exhibit Payment, #4 Exhibit Atkins Facebook promotion of Riley, #5 Exhibit Press Release, #6 Exhibit Cease and Desist, #7 Exhibit Atkins reply, #8 Exhibit Riley's Facebook page, #9 Exhibit Email from Riley to promoters, #10 Exhibit TV Interview, #11 Exhibit Atkins Facebook post) (Orlando, Lisa)
February 12, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively, to Transfer This Action, Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer This Action filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Website, #3 Exhibit Facebook, #4 Exhibit Marquee, #5 Exhibit Videos, #6 Exhibit Affidavit, #7 Exhibit Affidavit, #8 Exhibit Letter, #9 Exhibit Contract, #10 Exhibit Contract, #11 Exhibit Social Media, #12 Exhibit Do the Bay) (Orlando, Lisa)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Grimes, K.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Jan Mark Land (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Jan Mark Land. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Renee Atkins (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Renee Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by John Eaton (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by John Eaton. (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #24 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Melvin Riley (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Melvin Riley. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Ross, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Sipchen on behalf of Daniel Dillman. (Sipchen, James)
February 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2019 re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (LSau)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Dillman (Nelligan, Brendan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan J. Nelligan on behalf of Daniel Dillman. (Nelligan, Brendan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrin A. Auito on behalf of Renee Atkins, John Eaton, Jan Mark Land, Melvin Riley. (Auito, Darrin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively, to Transfer This Action, Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service by Daniel Dillman. (Kraatz, Carina)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John Eaton served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Ross, Mark)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Melvin Riley served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (Ross, Mark)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to John Eaton after multiple attempts. (Orlando, Lisa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Melvin Riley after multiple attempts. (Orlando, Lisa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Ross on behalf of Jan Mark Land. (Ross, Mark)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carina M. Kraatz on behalf of Daniel Dillman. (Kraatz, Carina)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Ross on behalf of Renee Atkins. (Ross, Mark)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Ross on behalf of John Eaton. (Ross, Mark)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Ross on behalf of Melvin Riley. (Ross, Mark)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Response due by 1/28/2019 Reply due by 1/30/2019 Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #4 and Notice Setting Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
January 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jan Mark Land served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Orlando, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Daniel Dillman served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Orlando, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Renee Atkins served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Orlando, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buy tickets for show 1, #2 Exhibit Advertisement for show 2, #3 Exhibit buy tickets and full color advertisement for show 3, #4 Exhibit buy tickets and full color advertisement for show 4, #5 Exhibit Full color advertisement for show 5, #6 Exhibit Full color advertisement for show 6, #7 Exhibit Trademark registration certificate) (Orlando, Lisa)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Orlando, Lisa)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 2:19-cv-10062 filed by Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7055675 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesse - County Where Action Arose: Genesse - County of 1st Defendant: Genesse. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit Trademark registration, #4 Exhibit Email from Defendant Riley, #5 Exhibit Shareholders Agreement, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Terry Harvey, #7 Exhibit Email from Defendant Riley to concert promoters, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff announcement of replacement of Defendant Riley, #9 Exhibit Affidavit of Otis Warren, #10 Exhibit Composite of promotional and advertising materials where Defendant used "Ready 4 the World", #11 Exhibit Marquee of BAL Theater, #12 Exhibit Cease and desist letter, #13 Exhibit Email between concert promoters showing confusion, #14 Exhibit Defendant Riley's facebook page using trademark and directing interest to Defendant Atkins, #15 Exhibit Composite of Defendants' social media posts, #16 Exhibit Advertisements for future shows using trademark) (Orlando, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Mark Land
Represented By: Mark E. Ross
Represented By: Darrin A. Auito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Riley
Represented By: Mark E. Ross
Represented By: Darrin A. Auito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eaton
Represented By: Mark E. Ross
Represented By: Darrin A. Auito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dillman
Represented By: Brendan J. Nelligan
Represented By: James J. Sipchen
Represented By: Carina M. Kraatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Atkins
Represented By: Mark E. Ross
Represented By: Darrin A. Auito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ready for the World Inc., d/b/a Ready for the World
Represented By: Lisa J. Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?