H&H Wholesale Services, Inc. et al v. World Nutrition, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chiropractors Buying Group, Inc. and H&H Wholesale Services, Inc.
Defendant: Ryuji Hirooka and World Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10063
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
1 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Stipulated Order Dismissing Case on H&H Wholesale Services, Inc. at 3910 Telegraph Road Suite 200, Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302. (DPar)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Partial Response and Request for a Seven-Day Extension by All Defendants. (Frank, Jonathan)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Ryuji Hirooka, World Nutrition, Inc. to Show Cause why Case should not be Remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction: Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryuji Hirooka, World Nutrition, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 18-170678-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7056139 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Frank, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&H Wholesale Services, Inc. et al v. World Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryuji Hirooka
Represented By: Jonathan B. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan B. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiropractors Buying Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Ritenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&H Wholesale Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?