Smith v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Sheldy Smith and Mary Rowan
Defendant: Dwayne Jones, City of Detroit and Stacey Taylor
Case Number: 2:2019cv10103
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas E. Kuhn appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kuhn, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 2/19/2019 is Cancelled re #3 Notice to Appear. The status conference sill be rescheduled after new defendant has been served and an answer filed. (MVer)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by City of Detroit. (Ashu, Alfred)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dwayne Jones. (Ashu, Alfred)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *Stacey Taylor* (SOso)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Dwayne Jones* (SOso)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *City of Detroit* (SOso)
January 29, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Robinson, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Notice of Error, To Defendant Dewayne Jones' Special and Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to Notice of Error, Mary Rowan's Reply to Defendant City of Detroit's Answer to Complaint and Special and Affirmative Defenses by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, David)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Mary Rowan as full Conservator for Sheldy Smith, a legally incapacitated Individual filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Robinson, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 2/19/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystal A. Crittendon on behalf of City of Detroit, Dwayne Jones. (Crittendon, Krystal)
January 11, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Mary Rowan. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF (Ashu, Alfred)
January 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Alfred Ashu re #1 Notice of Removal,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (ATee)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dwayne Jones, City of Detroit from Third Circuit Judicial Court, case number 18-014931-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7061283 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit Defendant Dwayne Jones Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint., #4 Exhibit Defendant City of Detroits Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint.) (Ashu, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldy Smith
Represented By: David A. Robinson
Represented By: Thomas E. Kuhn
Represented By: Brandon McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Rowan
Represented By: David A. Robinson
Represented By: Thomas E. Kuhn
Represented By: Brandon McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Jones
Represented By: Alfred Ashu
Represented By: Krystal A. Crittendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Detroit
Represented By: Alfred Ashu
Represented By: Krystal A. Crittendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?