Estuardo Calvo v. US Attorney General et al
Petitioner: Erick Estuardo Calvo
Respondent: Detroit Field Office Rebecca Adducci, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Director of, US Attorney General, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Director of and Board of Immigration Appeals
Amicus Curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Case Number: 2:2019cv10117
Filed: January 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to participate in hearing re #9 Amicus Curiae Brief, #4 MOTION to Vacate Stay of Removal, #5 Order by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan. (Aukerman, Miriam)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Aukerman, Miriam)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Vacate Stay of Removal filed by All Defendants. (Goulding, Jonathan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Vacate Stay of Removal filed by Erick Estuardo Calvo. (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Erick Estuardo Calvo against Rebecca Adducci, Board of Immigration Appeals, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Director of, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Director of, US Attorney General. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Stay Order) (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING, CONTINUING THE STAY OF PETITIONER'S REMOVAL PROCEEDINGS, AND INVITING AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 1/14/2019: Set Deadlines/Hearings as to #4 MOTION to Vacate Stay of Removal: Response due by 1/18/2019, Reply due by 1/25/2019, Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate Stay of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Goulding, Jonathan)
January 14, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Goulding on behalf of All Defendants. (Goulding, Jonathan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Goulding on behalf of All Defendants. (Goulding, Jonathan)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Caridad Pastor Cardinale re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Other Names of Respondents were omitted and only titles entered on docket. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
January 13, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Erick Estuardo Calvo against Rebecca Adducci, Board of Immigration Appeals, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Director of, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Director of, US Attorney General. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7063699 - Fee: 400 dollars. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Order, #2 Exhibit Ms. Calvo's Declaration, #3 Exhibit Emergency Stay Requests Fact Sheet) (Pastor Cardinale, Caridad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estuardo Calvo v. US Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Detroit Field Office Rebecca Adducci
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Director of
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Office for Immigration Review, Director of
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Immigration Appeals
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erick Estuardo Calvo
Represented By: Caridad Pastor Cardinale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?