New York Life Insurance Company v. Scrimger et al
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary Scrimger, Christine Bradley, William McNeight, Julianne McNeight, Ryan McNeight and Jacquelyn Ireland
Case Number: 2:2019cv10146
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Christine Bradley waiver sent on 3/11/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Massaquoi, Hans)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. William McNeight waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Massaquoi, Hans)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Julianne McNeight waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Massaquoi, Hans) Modified on 2/13/2019 (DWor). [WAIVER SENT ON 1/28/19]
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jacquelyn Ireland waiver sent on 2/5/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Massaquoi, Hans) Modified on 2/13/2019 (DWor). [WAIVER SENT ON 1/28/19]
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Phillip L. Sternberg appearing on behalf of Julianne McNeight (Sternberg, Phillip)
January 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Mary Scrimger* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *William McNeight* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Ryan McNeight* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Julianne McNeight* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Jacquelyn Ireland* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Christine Bradley* (SOso)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Hans J. Massaquoi re #2 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Interpleader filed by New York Life Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7067247 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: New York County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Shiawassee. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A through E) (Massaquoi, Hans)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by New York Life Insurance Company against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A through E) (Massaquoi, Hans)[INCORRECT EVENT USED; TO BE RE-FILED WITH THE COMPLAINT EVENT TO GENERATE JUDGE SELECTION AND PAYMENT] Modified on 1/15/2019 (DPer).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. Scrimger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Scrimger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McNeight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julianne McNeight
Represented By: Phillip L. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McNeight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Hans J. Massaquoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?