Pauli v. MBT Financial Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Pauli
Defendant: Joseph S. Vig, John L. Skibski, Debra J. Shah, Tony Scavuzzo, Peter H. Carlton, Kristine L. Barann, Joseph S. Daly, Michael J. Miller, MBT Financial Corp., James F. Deutsch and H. Douglas Chaffin
Consolidated Plaintiff: David Pill
Case Number: 2:2019cv10181
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED ORDER Staying the Briefing Schedule and Extending the Time for Defendants to Answer. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of Dismissal *as to David Pill*. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Pill (Abb, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2019 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Christopher Pauli. Disposition: Motion Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (RLou)
February 6, 2019 Filing 29 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *02/06/19*. Designated lead case number is *19-10181*. (DPer)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christopher Pauli. (Miller, E.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mahde Y. Abdallah on behalf of Christopher Pauli. (Abdallah, Mahde)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Palestina on behalf of Christopher Pauli. (Palestina, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Christopher Pauli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE and ORDER for Plaintiffs to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for Expedited Consideration filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proxy Statement, #2 Exhibit Chaffin Declaration) (Kemp, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proxy Statement) (Kemp, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Kemp, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Dillon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dillon, Thomas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Kemp on behalf of All Defendants. (Kemp, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Scheduling Hearing on #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for Expedited Consideration. Response due by 2/1/2019, Reply due by 2/4/2019, Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings for Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/25/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for Expedited Consideration by Christopher Pauli Amended Certificate of Service (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Joseph S. Vig waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. John L. Skibski waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Debra J. Shah waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Tony Scavuzzo waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michael J. Miller waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. MBT Financial Corp. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. James F. Deutsch waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Joseph S. Daly waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. H. Douglas Chaffin waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Peter H. Carlton waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Kristine L. Barann waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Miller, E.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Request for Expedited Consideration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-Proxy, #3 Exhibit 2-Unpublished Cases) (Miller, E.)
January 18, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Almonrode, Sharon)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7072511 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Monroe - County Where Action Arose: Monroe - County of 1st Defendant: Monroe. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cv-10076, Judge Linda V. Parker] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiff Shareholder Information) (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauli v. MBT Financial Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph S. Vig
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Skibski
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra J. Shah
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Scavuzzo
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Carlton
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine L. Barann
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph S. Daly
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBT Financial Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Deutsch
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Douglas Chaffin
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pauli
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Mahde Y. Abdallah
Represented By: Michael J. Palestina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Pill
Represented By: Robert J. Abb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?