Roche Diagnostics Corporation et al v. Dickstein et al
Plaintiff: Roche Diabetes Care, Inc. and Roche Diagnostics Corporation
Defendant: Christopher F. Shaya, James E. Binson, Donnie E. Dickstein and Kenneth G. Fasse
Case Number: 2:2019cv10264
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Christopher F. Shaya (Lennon, Edward)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Party Fault by Christopher F. Shaya (Lennon, Edward)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Christopher F. Shaya. (Lennon, Edward)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING Kenneth G. Fasse, James E. Binson and Donnie E. Dickstein - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Roche Diabetes Care, Inc., Roche Diagnostics Corporation PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order of Partial Dismissal) (Henney, Raymond)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Lennon on behalf of Christopher F. Shaya. (Lennon, Edward)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Roche Diabetes Care, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd. for Roche Diabetes Care, Inc.. (Henney, Raymond)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Roche Diagnostics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holding Ltd. for Roche Diagnostics Corporation. (Henney, Raymond)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7081681 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Marion - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Southern District of Indiana, 1:17-cv-0949-TWP-DML, Judge Tanya Walton Pratt] (Henney, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roche Diagnostics Corporation et al v. Dickstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Diabetes Care, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond W. Henney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Diagnostics Corporation
Represented By: Raymond W. Henney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher F. Shaya
Represented By: Edward G. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Binson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie E. Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth G. Fasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?