Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005 v. Scientific Exercise, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005
Defendant: Scientific Exercise, Inc., Randy Lubinsky and Quest Capital Partners, LC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10358
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Vacating #3 Order to Show Cause - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Homfeld II, LLC v Com Air Holdings, Inc., 53 F. App'x 731, 732 (6th Cir. 2002), #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Paul Glantz, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2018 Florida Profit Corporation Annual Report for Scientific Exercise, Inc., #6 Exhibit 5 - Florida Department of State Corporation Search Result for Quest Capital Partners, LC, #7 Exhibit 6 - Carrollton Hospitality, LLC v Kentucky Insight Partners II, LP, 2013 WL 5934638, #8 Exhibit 7 - Public Funding Corp. v Lawrence County Fiscal Court, 892 F.2d 80 (6th Cir. Dec. 21, 1989), #9 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of John C. Stevenson, #10 Exhibit 9 - 2017 Economics of Law Practice - Attorney Income and Billing Rate Summary Report, #11 Exhibit 10 - Breakdown of attorney fees to date) (Stevenson, John)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for John C. Stevenson on behalf of Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005 to Show Cause why in writing, why this cause should not be dismissed for failure to meet the jurisdictional amount in controversy requirement - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
February 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Randy Lubinsky, Quest Capital Partners, LC, Scientific Exercise, Inc.* (SKra)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005 against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7094887 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County, Michigan - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, Michigan - County of 1st Defendant: Orange County, Florida. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Subscription Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Email requesting records, June 2018, #4 Exhibit 3 - August 13, 2018 correspondence requesting financial information, #5 Exhibit 4 - December 8, 2018 email and January 29, 2019 correspondence requesting inspection) (Stevenson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005 v. Scientific Exercise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scientific Exercise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Capital Partners, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Glantz, as Trustee of the Glantz Family Revocable Trust U/A December 31, 2005
Represented By: John C. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?