M.S. Willman v. United States Attorney General
Plaintiff: M. S. Willman
Defendant: Michigan Director State Police, Michigan Office of Governor, Attorney General S United States Attorney General and Michigan Office of Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2019cv10360
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Defendants, Office of the Governor of Michigan, Director of the Michigan State Police and Office of Michigan Attorney General re #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Reopen Case re #14 Stipulation and Order, Add and Terminate Parties, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #14 Stipulation and Order, #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States :( Response due by 4/19/2019), Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Defendants, Michigan Office of Governor, Michigan Director State Police and Michigan Office of Attorney General re #1 Complaint Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
March 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States filed by S United States Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Supportive Unpublished Opinions) (Anchill, Benjamin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Froehlich on behalf of Michigan Director State Police, Michigan Office of Attorney General, Michigan Office of Governor. (Froehlich, Joseph)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States :( Response due by 3/29/2019, Reply due by 4/22/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint and Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michigan Director State Police, Michigan Office of Attorney General, Michigan Office of Governor by All Plaintiffs. (Willman, Daniel) Modified on 3/8/2019 (DWor). [WRONG EVENT SELECTED - DOCUMENT IS A REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT]
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond re #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States, :( Response due by 3/25/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Willman, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (SKra)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan Director State Police, Michigan Office of Attorney General, Michigan Office of Governor, S United States Attorney General* (SKra)
February 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Permanent Injunction M.S. Willman v. United States by M. S. Willman. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Document Continuation Declaration of Plaintiff Brother) (Willman, Daniel)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT M.S. Willman v. United States filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7094961 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Washington D.C.. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits 1-13) (Willman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. Willman v. United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Director State Police
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Office of Governor
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General S United States Attorney General
Represented By: Benjamin A. Anchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Office of Attorney General
Represented By: Joseph T. Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. S. Willman
Represented By: Daniel C. Willman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?