Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC v. The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company

Plaintiff: Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC
Defendant: The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10399
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
2 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Certificate of Service) (Newman, Jason)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason T. Newman appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Newman, Jason)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Dearing Compressor and Pump Company for The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company. (Lanfear, R.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Lanfear, R.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert C. Donovan on behalf of Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC. (Donovan, Herbert)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Disqualification of Judge and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow to District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (NAhm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC (Letzmann, Matthew)
February 8, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company* (SKra)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC against The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7100213 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Susquehanna County, PA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Mahoning County, OH. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Letzmann, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC v. The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dearing Compressor and Pump Company
Represented By: R. Carl Lanfear
Represented By: Jason T. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluestone Pipeline Company of Pennsylvania, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Letzmann
Represented By: Herbert C. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?