Barmes v. Social Security, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: William Charles Barmes
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Case Number: 2:2019cv10468
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of served on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Social Security, Commissioner of* (DPer)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (MarW)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett J. TenHave-Chapman on behalf of William Charles Barmes. (TenHave-Chapman, Garrett)
February 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (DWor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by William Charles Barmes. (Osterhout, Karl)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William Charles Barmes against Social Security, Commissioner of. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bay - County Where Action Arose: Bay - County of 1st Defendant: Michigan. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barmes v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Charles Barmes
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Garrett J. TenHave-Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?