Assi v. Petsche et al
Plaintiff: Mostafa Fawzi Assi
Defendant: Elizabeth Petsche, Bilal Saleem and National Board of Osteopathic Medical Examiners
Case Number: 2:2019cv10508
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/18/2019) (LGra).
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (DPer)
March 6, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Directing Service by the US Marshal, #9 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Blank Summons and USM 285 Forms, on Mostafa Fawzi Assi at 22186 Beech St., Dearborn, MI 48124. (RLou)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Mostafa Fawzi Assi against defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Correction re #5 Directing Service by the US Marshal. (LGra) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/25/2019) (LGra).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 [ENTERED ON WRONG DOCKET] ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LGra) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/25/2019) (LGra).
February 25, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order, on Mostafa Fawzi Assi at 22186 Beech St., Dearborn, MI 48124. (RLou)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to File Amended Complaint (Amended Complaint due by 3/18/19). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Mostafa Fawzi Assi. (DPer)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mostafa Fawzi Assi against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assi v. Petsche et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Petsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilal Saleem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Board of Osteopathic Medical Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mostafa Fawzi Assi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?