Schwendimann et al v. Stahls', Inc.,
Plaintiff: Jodi A Schwendimann and NuCoat, Inc.
Defendant: Stahls', Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2019cv10525
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stahls', Inc., (Forbis, Glenn)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Britta Schnoor Loftus appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Loftus, Britta)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle E. Dawson appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Dawson, Michelle)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Devan V. Padmanabhan appearing on behalf of NuCoat, Inc., Jodi A Schwendimann (Padmanabhan, Devan)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 4/15/2019). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn E. Forbis on behalf of Stahls', Inc.,. (Forbis, Glenn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stahls', Inc., served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Lund, Matthew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Lund, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Matthew J. Lund. Form AO 120 is missing. The filing attorney must file the form found on www.uscourts.gov with the Court to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
February 21, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Stahls', Inc.,* (SOso)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by NuCoat, Inc. (Lund, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jodi A Schwendimann, NuCoat, Inc. against Stahls', Inc., with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7118474 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Hennepin - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Lund, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwendimann et al v. Stahls', Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi A Schwendimann
Represented By: Matthew J. Lund
Represented By: Devan V. Padmanabhan
Represented By: Michelle E. Dawson
Represented By: Britta Schnoor Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NuCoat, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Lund
Represented By: Devan V. Padmanabhan
Represented By: Michelle E. Dawson
Represented By: Britta Schnoor Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stahls', Inc.,
Represented By: Glenn E. Forbis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?