Bazzy v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Jane Bazzy
Defendant: Michigan, State of, William P. Barr, United States of America and Dana Nessel
Petitioner: Marguerite Martin, Rhonda T. Favero, Cora Lou Harris, John Hull, Jacqueline Knapp, Julie Fisher, Rodney LaPlant, Lawrence L. Favero, Jaime Hull, Saundra J. Wilson, Douglas Leigh Hughes and Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Case Number: 2:2019cv10541
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to join by Julie Fisher. (DPer)
April 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to join by Cora Lou Harris. (DPer)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to join by Jacqueline Knapp. (DPer)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to join by Marguerite Martin. (DPer)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to join by Rodney LaPlant. (DPer)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to join by John Hull. (DPer)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to join by Jaime Hull. (DPer)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Join by Pamela Molnar. (SSch)
March 28, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Certificate of Service, #11 Order, on Karen Diann Davis Hughes, Lawrence L. Favero, Rhonda T. Favero, Douglas Leigh Hughes, Saundra J. Wilson at addresses on record. (DTof)
March 28, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order, #12 Judgment on Melissa Jane Bazzy at 3501 Lakeshore Drive, Newport, MI 48166. (DTof)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE #1 Complaint filed by Melissa Jane Bazzy, GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Melissa Jane Bazzy AND DENYING Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Join by Saundra J. Wilson. (NAhm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Melissa J. Bazzy (DPer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to join by Douglas Leigh Hughes. (DPer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to join by Karen Diann Davis Hughes. (DPer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to join by Lawrence L. Favero. (DPer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to join by Rhonda T. Favero. (DPer)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Melissa Jane Bazzy. (NAhm)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Melissa Jane Bazzy against All Defendants (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazzy v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jane Bazzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marguerite Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cora Lou Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacqueline Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney LaPlant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saundra J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Leigh Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?