Transou v. Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Gentry P. Transou
Defendant: County of Oakland, Marcus Bass, N. Stoner, C. Lemke, Mclaren Oakland Hospital, Teachout Security Solutions, Inc. and B.K. Teachout,Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10547
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY To Affirmative Defenses of McLaren Oakland Hospital by Gentry P. Transou. (Finegood, Kenneth)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued for *B.K. Teachout,Inc., Teachout Security Solutions, Inc.* (DWor)
April 1, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for B.K. Teachout,Inc., Teachout Security Solutions, Inc.. (Finegood, Kenneth)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gentry P. Transou against All Parties. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Finegood, Kenneth)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mclaren Oakland Hospital identifying Corporate Parent McLaren Oakland for Mclaren Oakland Hospital. (Trust, Jared)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Mclaren Oakland Hospital. (Trust, Jared)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jared M. Trust appearing on behalf of Mclaren Oakland Hospital (Trust, Jared)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Complaint (Defendant Oakland County Responsive Pleading due by 5/17/2019) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Menna on behalf of C. Lemke, County of Oakland, N. Stoner. (Menna, Peter)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. N. Stoner waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Finegood, Kenneth)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. C. Lemke waiver sent on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Finegood, Kenneth)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. County of Oakland served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Finegood, Kenneth)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing State Law Claims re #1 Complaint - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
February 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Gentry P. Transou against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7121383 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Finegood, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transou v. Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Oakland
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Stoner
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lemke
Represented By: Peter L. Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mclaren Oakland Hospital
Represented By: Jared M. Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachout Security Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.K. Teachout,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentry P. Transou
Represented By: Kenneth D. Finegood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?