Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Michigan Pain Management PLLC et al

Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: William Gonte, M.D., James Deweese, Fatina Masri, M.D., Jonathan Maffia, Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC, Albert Jerome, D.C., North Shore Injury Center, Inc., Elias Goldstein, D.C., Natham Karrumi, D.C., Precision MRI of Michigan LLC d/b/a Precise MRI, Ali Faraj, Medi Transit Inc., Frances Madden, M.D., Advanced Surgery Center, LLC, Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC, Southfield Pain Management, PLLC, Michigan Pain Management PLLC, Haitham Masri, M.D. and James Padula, D.O.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10579
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 43 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Medi Transit Inc. (Joelson, Peter)
April 29, 2019 Filing 42 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by North Shore Injury Center, Inc. (Joelson, Peter)
April 29, 2019 Filing 41 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC (Joelson, Peter)
April 29, 2019 Filing 40 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC (Joelson, Peter)
April 29, 2019 Filing 39 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Michigan Pain Management PLLC (Joelson, Peter)
April 29, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC, James Deweese, Ali Faraj, Elias Goldstein, D.C., Albert Jerome, D.C., Frances Madden, M.D., Jonathan Maffia, Medi Transit Inc., Michigan Pain Management PLLC, North Shore Injury Center, Inc., James Padula, D.O., Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC. (Joelson, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Advanced Surgery Center, LLC, Fatina Masri, M.D., Haitham Masri, M.D.. (Fink, Nathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of Advanced Surgery Center, LLC, Fatina Masri, M.D., Haitham Masri, M.D.. (Bressack, Darryl)
March 25, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of Advanced Surgery Center, LLC, Fatina Masri, M.D., Haitham Masri, M.D.. (Fink, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. William Gonte, M.D. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 21, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Southfield Pain Management, PLLC served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 18, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Fatina Masri, M.D. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 18, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Haitham Masri, M.D. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 18, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Advanced Surgery Center, LLC waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 12, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Precision MRI of Michigan LLC d/b/a Precise MRI waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 12, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Natham Karrumi, D.C. waiver sent on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. James Deweese waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. North Shore Injury Center, Inc. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Medi Transit Inc. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Ali Faraj waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary R. Blumberg on behalf of James Deweese, Ali Faraj, Medi Transit Inc., North Shore Injury Center, Inc.. (Blumberg, Gary)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Warren on behalf of James Deweese, Ali Faraj, Medi Transit Inc., North Shore Injury Center, Inc.. (Warren, Emily)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of James Deweese, Ali Faraj, Medi Transit Inc., North Shore Injury Center, Inc.. (Joelson, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G. Gutbezahl on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Gutbezahl, Adam)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh to District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (NAhm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary R. Blumberg on behalf of Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC, Elias Goldstein, D.C., Albert Jerome, D.C., Frances Madden, M.D., Jonathan Maffia, Michigan Pain Management PLLC, James Padula, D.O., Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC. (Blumberg, Gary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Warren on behalf of Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC, Elias Goldstein, D.C., Albert Jerome, D.C., Frances Madden, M.D., Jonathan Maffia, Michigan Pain Management PLLC, James Padula, D.O., Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC. (Warren, Emily)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Joelson on behalf of Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC, Elias Goldstein, D.C., Albert Jerome, D.C., Frances Madden, M.D., Jonathan Maffia, Michigan Pain Management PLLC, James Padula, D.O., Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC. (Joelson, Peter)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Michigan Pain Management PLLC waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Jonathan Maffia waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. James Padula, D.O. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Frances Madden, M.D. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Elias Goldstein, D.C. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Albert Jerome, D.C. waiver sent on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. DeNinno on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (DeNinno, Andrew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Tilden on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tilden, Nathan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. King, Jr on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (King, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Certificate of No Liability Insurance (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Esurance Insurance Company, Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company against Advanced Surgery Center, LLC, Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC, James Deweese, Ali Faraj, Elias Goldstein, D.C., William Gonte, M.D., Albert Jerome, D.C., Natham Karrumi, D.C., Frances Madden, M.D., Jonathan Maffia, Fatina Masri, M.D., Haitham Masri, M.D., Medi Transit Inc., Michigan Pain Management PLLC, North Shore Injury Center, Inc., James Padula, D.O., Precision MRI of Michigan LLC d/b/a Precise MRI, Southfield Pain Management, PLLC, Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7124780 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Cook County, IL - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Michigan Pain Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #3 Exhibit 2 - Dearborn Pain Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #4 Exhibit 3 - Southfield Pain Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sterling Heights Pain Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #6 Exhibit 5 - Precise MRI Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #7 Exhibit 6 - Advanced Surgery Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #8 Exhibit 7 - North Shore Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #9 Exhibit 8 - Medi Transit Chart of Patients and Treatment at Issue, #10 Exhibit 9 - Frances Madden Settlement Agreement, #11 Exhibit 10 - Johnny Trotter Federal Indictment, #12 Exhibit 11 - January 11, 2018 pre-filled document for Patient R.C., #13 Exhibit 12 - HICF allegedly signed by Johnny Trotter, #14 Exhibit 13 - 510(k) Determination for Acu-Stim, #15 Exhibit 14 - ANSi Request to CMS, #16 Exhibit 15 - Precise MRI Letter of Intent, #17 Exhibit 16 - Precise MRI Lease, #18 Exhibit 17 - Precise MRI Statement of Revenue and Expense, #19 Exhibit 18 - Mail and Wire Fraud Chart, #20 Exhibit 19 - Michigan Pain Damages Chart, #21 Exhibit 20 - Dearborn Pain Damages Chart, #22 Exhibit 21 - Southfield Pain Damages Chart, #23 Exhibit 22 - Sterling Heights Pain Damages Chart, #24 Exhibit 23 - Precise MRI Damages Chart, #25 Exhibit 24 - Advanced Surgery Damages Chart, #26 Exhibit 25 - North Shore Damages Chart, #27 Exhibit 26 - Medi Transit Damages Chart, #28 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #29 Proposed Summonses) (McEttrick, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Michigan Pain Management PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gonte, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deweese
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatina Masri, M.D.
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Maffia
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Heights Pain Management, PLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Jerome, D.C.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore Injury Center, Inc.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias Goldstein, D.C.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natham Karrumi, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision MRI of Michigan LLC d/b/a Precise MRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Faraj
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medi Transit Inc.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Madden, M.D.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dearborn Pain Specialists, PLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Pain Management, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Pain Management PLLC
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haitham Masri, M.D.
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Padula, D.O.
Represented By: Emily R. Warren
Represented By: Gary R. Blumberg
Represented By: Peter W. Joelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esurance Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew H. DeNinno
Represented By: Jacquelyn McEttrick
Represented By: Richard D. King, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Tilden
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?