United States of America v. Currency $106,904.00 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency $3,115.13 and Currency $106,904.00
Case Number: 2:2019cv10589
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #12 Answer to Complaint and Dismiss Interest by United States of America. (Ramamurthy, Shankar)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Goldberg, Marshall)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marshall E. Goldberg appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Goldberg, Marshall)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Withdrawing #8 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America re #8 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute Plaintiff Response to Order to Show Cause (Ramamurthy, Shankar)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2019 Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, #3 Warrant Issued, #6 Warrant Issued, #5 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Ramamurthy, Shankar)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (NAhm)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
February 27, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued for Currency $106,904.00 (SSch)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued for Currency $3,115.13 (SSch)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael El-Zein on behalf of United States of America. (El-Zein, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America against Currency $106,904.00, Currency $3,115.13. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ramamurthy, Shankar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency $106,904.00 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $3,115.13
Represented By: Marshall E. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $106,904.00
Represented By: Marshall E. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Shankar Ramamurthy
Represented By: Michael El-Zein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?